Financial history LEISURE UNITED

Charity number: 1174371
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.56m £2.42m £5.24m £5.61m £8.53m
Total expenditure £2.82m £2.46m £4.12m £5.11m £7.69m
Income from government contracts £0 £150.65k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £67.70k £320.68k £284.62k £187.24k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £843.60k £150.25k £1.15m £1.53m £2.41m
Income - Charitable activities £2.58m £1.43m £3.97m £4.06m £6.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £135.25k £834.56k £124.24k £17.19k £38.31k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.50m £2.41m £3.65m £4.37m £6.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £320.51k £0 £455.80k £745.00k £1.18m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £7.37k £0 £0 £18.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £51.70k £14.32k £0 £0