Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. FRANCIS, WEST BESSACARR
Charity number: 1169458

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV RICHARD ADRIAN HEARD | Chair | 07 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Goodman | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Stella McHugh | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Picken | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Hall | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Kaill | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Archer | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Gaylor | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mrs E K Gibson | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ELLISON | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Davies | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILLIP HARGREAVES JACKSON | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Bennett | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH ANN HALLAM | Trustee | 27 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.