Financial history MORRIS MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 1169621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.35k £20.74k £11.36k £20.73k £4.24k
Total expenditure £2.54k £1.90k £2.74k £18.84k £3.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.00k N/A N/A