IBD PASSPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to support individuals with inflammatory bowel disease to travel by providing support and reputable education via a multi-level online platform.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 24 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Isobel Mason | Chair | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr CHARLES MURRAY | Trustee | 21 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr PHILLIP SMITH | Trustee | 21 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £161.68k | £162.44k | £1.15k | £0 | £114 | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.77k | £138.04k | £35.00k | £17.34k | £10.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 November 2024 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 February 2025 | 110 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 November 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 December 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 June 2023 | 238 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2021 | 370 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH CROHN’S DISEASE AND ULCERATIVE COLITIS (INFLAMMATORY BOWEL DISEASE) WHO PLAN TO TRAVEL BY EDUCATING AND INFORMING SUFFERERS OF THESE DISEASES THROUGH PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 48
Camberley House
Redhill Street
LONDON
NW1 4AX
- Phone:
- 07745845777
- Email:
- info@ibdpassport.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window