SHAIKH 'ABD AL-QADIR AL-GAYLANI FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity has been focused on fund raising to establish a Sufi centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 November 2016: CIO registration
- AL-GAYLANI FOUNDATION (Working name)
- AL-JILANI FOUNDATION (Working name)
- SHAIKH ÆABD AL-QADIR AL-JILANI FOUNDATION (Working name)
- SHAIKH ÆABD AL-QADIR AL-GAYLANI FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr LOUAY FATOOHI PHD | Chair | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
USMON KHADIM | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
KHADAM HUSSAIN | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED NAZIR | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr SHETHA AL-DARGAZELLI PHD | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £445 | £40 | £230 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £390 | £50 | £189 | £0 | £36 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 26 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PEACEFUL SUFI SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS OF ISLAM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) THE PROMOTION OF THE SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS OF THE GREAT SUFI MASTER AND SCHOLAR SHAIKH ‘ABD AL-QADIR AL-GAYLANI (AL-JILANI) AND, HIS SUCCESSORS, THE MASTERS OF THE SUFI ORDER "TARIQA ‘ALIYYA QADIRIYYA KASNAZANIYYA". (B) THE EXPOSURE AND REBUTTAL OF DISTORTED INTERPRETATIONS OF ISLAM THAT PRESENT IT AS A VIOLENT OR INTOLERANT RELIGION. (C) THE PROVISION OF LITERATURE, LECTURES, AND MEETINGS TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE SUFI INTERPRETATION OF ISLAM, HELP PEOPLE DEVELOP SPIRITUALLY, REFUTE EXTREMIST VIEWS OF ISLAM, AND PROMOTE INTERFAITH DIALOGUE. (D) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF PLACES OF SPIRITUAL WORSHIP FOR PERFORMING THE SUFI PRACTICE OF DHIKR (REMEMBRANCE OF GOD). (2) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. (3) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND FOOD AND CLOTHING TO THE NEEDY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 SEVERNE ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B27 7HL
- Phone:
- 07947320624
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window