Financial history GUISBOROUGH CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 508845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.50k £1 £5.38k £10.41k £10.14k
Total expenditure £6.07k £381 £4.82k £9.87k £11.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A