Trustees GUISBOROUGH CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 508845
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN WHITEHEAD | Chair | 17 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Ainsworth | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wayne Brown | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Robinson | Trustee | 23 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jean Woods | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Fulke | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ann Garbutt | Trustee | 14 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
COLIN GEOFFREY VAUX | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.