WE SHINE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We Shine supports the families of children with additional needs in Surrey, UK. We operate a peer support network and arrange inclusive activities for the whole family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 April 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION IN SURREY AMONGST CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES WHO HAVE ADDITIONAL NEEDS AND THEIR PARENTS, CARERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR DISABILITIES AND ADDITIONAL NEEDS BY THE: · PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND GUIDANCE; · PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS, FORUMS, AND GENERAL SUPPORT; · PROVISION OF DEDICATED PLAYGROUPS FOR THE UNDER 5’S WITH ADDITIONAL NEEDS; AND · PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND SOCIAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window