THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ALBAN AND ST PATRICK, HIGHGATE, BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the whole mission of the Church of England, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical in the ecclesiastical parish of St Alban and St Patrick, Highgate, Birmingham; and caring for the Grade II* listed Church of St Alban the Martyr.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £9,543 from 4 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 28 October 2016: Standard registration
- ST ALBANS PCC, HIGHGATE, BIRMINGHAM (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela E Sones | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Cynthia Jane SOMERVILLE | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Bryce Edward Somerville | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr CHRISTOPHER ANDREW SMITH | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
EDWARD JOHN FELLOWS | Trustee | 09 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
MAUREEN NORAH FELLOWS | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr ANDREW TIMOTHY HINDLEY HARVEY | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr RACHEL LILIAN SMITH | Trustee | 28 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Dr FAY WILSON | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|||||||
AMANDA MARY CADMAN | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £348.45k | £153.73k | £77.11k | £96.71k | £120.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £489.41k | £174.43k | £84.23k | £78.70k | £150.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.47k | £12.30k | £3.67k | £2.38k | £9.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
120 Stanhope Street
Highgate
Birmingham
B12 0XB
- Phone:
- 0121 471 1301
- Email:
- info@saintalban.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window