THE SHEFFIELD CATS SHELTER

Charity number: 1172162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of the charity is to relieve and prevent the suffering and distress amongst cats in need of care and attention and to promote the welfare of cats.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 1963: Standard registration
  • 21 July 2015: Funds received from
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jade Rachael Blair-Clarke Chair 27 January 2020
None on record
Clare Rushen Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Christopher Michael Hurst Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Catherine Jane McManus Trustee 19 August 2020
None on record
Jemma Gurr Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £306.30k £302.57k £550.44k £513.91k £514.66k
Total expenditure £385.79k £383.98k £386.68k £478.88k £564.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.69k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £337.66k £264.35k £222.30k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £199.37k £234.30k £273.63k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £12.43k £13.96k £12.89k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £983 £1.30k £5.84k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £205.15k £129.53k £85.64k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £383.35k £474.51k £547.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £3.33k £4.37k £16.52k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £1.89k £0 £6.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A £380.35k £381.67k £379.77k
Long-term investments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A £446.35k £486.64k £448.47k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A £37.44k £43.19k £51.88k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 28 June 2024 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 28 June 2024 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 04 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 04 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 10 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 10 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 27 May 2021 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 27 May 2021 27 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/04/1979 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 19/03/2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND PREVENT SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST CATS.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT
Registration history
  • 08 October 1963 : Standard registration
  • 21 July 2015 : Asset transfer in

Contact information

Address:
1 Travis Place
Sheffield
S10 2DB
Phone:
01142724441