Governing document TEESMOUTH BIRD CLUB
Charity number: 508850

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 DEC 1960 AS AMENDED ON 03 NOV 1978 AS AMENDED ON 06 APR 2005 AS AMENDED ON 04 APR 2011 as amended on 04 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE STUDY OF AND PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ORNITHOLOGY AND TO UNDERTAKE CONSERVATION PROJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF BIRDS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.