BYWYD GWYLLT GLASLYN WILDLIFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objectives of the charity are to protect and provide support to ensure the continuing success of ospreys nesting in the Glaslyn Valley, north-west Wales and to introduce local inhabitants and visitors to the wealth of other wildlife that is to be found in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 07 April 2017: Standard registration
- BGGW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gill Pritchard | Chair | 13 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary King | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Barbara Milne | Trustee | 12 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Wood | Trustee | 12 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Cooper | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Babbage | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GWENAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN PARRY | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ARCHER | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.23k | £95.68k | £116.88k | £95.87k | £358.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.43k | £58.11k | £86.37k | £80.35k | £115.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 February 2021 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 February 2021 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 MAR 2017 as amended on 12 Dec 2021 as amended on 07 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
5. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WILDLIFE IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO:- 5.1 PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY FOR THE PUBLIC, SCHOOLS AND EDUCATIONAL GROUPS TO SEE AND LEARN MORE ABOUT OSPREYS AND WILDLIFE IN THE GLASLYN AREA AND ITS ENVIRONS; AND 5.2 ENDEAVOUR TO ENSURE THE CONTINUED SUCCESS OF BREEDING OSPREYS IN THE GLASLYN AREA AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit F1 Intec
Ffordd Y Parc
Parc Menai
Bangor
Gwynedd
- Phone:
- 01766513871
- Email:
- info@glaslynwildlife.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window