SKIN HEALTH FOR ALL

Charity number: 1170899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Skin Health For All (SHFA) is a UK Charitable Trust set up in 2012 to provide care and rehabilitation to those suffering from skin disease or injury. SHFA supports the provision of financial assistance, education and practical advice to sufferers and carers alike. SHFA is currently focused on supporting efforts to eradicate Podoconiosis (non-filarial lower-leg elephantiasis) from Ethiopia.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 09 May 2024

Total income: £1,534
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Ethiopia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 2016: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR PAUL MATTS Trustee 22 January 2016
None on record
ALISON JEAN MATTS Trustee 10 May 2012
THE EAST TO WEST TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/05/2020 09/05/2021 09/05/2022 09/05/2023 09/05/2024
Total gross income £5.29k £2.70k £3.35k £3.61k £1.53k
Total expenditure £8.72k £4.54k £0 £6.53k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 May 2024 12 March 2025 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 09 May 2023 13 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 09 May 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 09 May 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 09 May 2020 11 March 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 09 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
10 Corrie Road
ADDLESTONE
KT15 2HT
Phone:
07812 544413
Website:

No information available