Trustees BEBE NANKI CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity Number: 508859

Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
jaspal singh sangar | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
surinder singh ajimal | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
jackie davinder kaur phull | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Balbir Singh Gill | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Avtar Singh Virdee | Trustee | 30 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nirmaljit Kaur Phull | Trustee | 08 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
AMARJIT KAUR KALSI | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
KULWINDER KAUR PADAN | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BIMLA DEVI LYALL | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.