Financial history THURROCK RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1172702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £59.59k £105.61k £124.14k £179.40k £228.46k
Total expenditure £61.35k £35.29k £120.63k £156.62k £178.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.56k £36.23k £9.60k N/A N/A