DIMOBI CHILDREN DISABILITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work closely with families and we believe that families of disabled children deserve better and we are driven to fight and advocate for what is right, driving innovation and change that benefit families of disabled children, focusing on the impact we make. We challenge disadvantage and tackle inequality and help our families to deal with the barriers they face daily.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £148,324 from 148324 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
79 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 December 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Regis Muketwa | Chair | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carmen Aguilera Cortes | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frank Manvura | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lenny Kamanga | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Olalekan Emmanuel Ayuba | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Munetsi | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.82k | £145.80k | £90.75k | £280.82k | £321.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.89k | £80.91k | £210.21k | £270.15k | £311.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £145.50k | £60.00k | £131.32k | £148.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Dec 2016 as amended on 05 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH AUTISM ,DISABILITY AND NEURODIVERSITY AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE; B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO AUTISM, DISABILITY AND NEURODIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Resonance Centre
The Old Schoolhouse
599 Ashton New Road
Clayton
MANCHESTER
M11 4RU
- Phone:
- 01619375332
- Email:
- Info@dimobitrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window