WEST NORFOLK WALKING FOR HEALTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide structured, supervised walks for those who wish to improve and then maintain their health in a social setting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 07 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN MACE | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marion Garrod | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Christine Steed | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Ann Mussett | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Turner | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Allan | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Miller Priddle | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
GWENDOLINE BARKER | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.03k | £987 | £1.29k | £709 | £1.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.45k | £511 | £1.91k | £1.55k | £2.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND PROMOTING A PROGRAMME OF HEALTH WALKS ACROSS WEST NORFOLK THAT ENCOURAGES PEOPLE TO TAKE UP AND MAINTAIN THIS EXERCISE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Beverley Way
Clenchwarton
King's Lynn
PE34 4EE
- Phone:
- 01553773164
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
westnorfolkwalkingforhealth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window