Accounts and annual returns SIAN GREEN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1170972
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 05 August 2024 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Annual return 01 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Annual return 01 April 2020 07 March 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 15 March 2021 42 days late