SIAN GREEN FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity part funds prosthetic limbs for Amputees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £750 | £4.54k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.98k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 186 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 07 March 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 42 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AMPUTEES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: PROVIDING GRANTS FOR SPECIALIST TREATMENT AND CARE; PROVIDING ADVICE, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION; PROVIDING PEER GROUP SUPPORT; RAISING AWARENESS OF AMPUTEES WITH A VIEW TO HELPING THE WIDER COMMUNITY UNDERSTAND THEIR NEEDS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window