DANA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to charitable and other organisations that further the organisation's objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Pakistan
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 17 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RASHID AHMED ALI DANA | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|||||
MOHAMED SAEED ALIBHAI DANA | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
YUSUF ALI DANA | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.47k | £90.16k | £66.21k | £45.23k | £39.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.37k | £75.01k | £50.55k | £66.94k | £41.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 NOV 2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 FORBURG ROAD
LONDON
N16 6HS
- Phone:
- 07846253986
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window