BAREFOOT COLLEGE INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To prevent and relieve poverty and to promote sustainable development, in socially and economically disadvantaged communities, in some of the least developed countries in the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Colombia
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- East Timor
- Ethiopia
- Fiji
- Ghana
- Guatemala
- India
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Mali
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nicaragua
- Nigeria
- Oman
- Papua New Guinea
- Peru
- Puerto Rico
- Rwanda
- Samoa
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- Solomon Islands
- South Africa
- Syria
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 16 February 2017: CIO registration
- BAREFOOT COLLEGE (Working name)
- BAREFOOT COLLEGE UK (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRACEY MARGARET BALCH | Chair | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ashanti Suvendrini Dickson | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lindsay-Bayley | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Binnie | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marion Gluck | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shevaun Haviland | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.09k | £114.17k | £101.21k | £72.31k | £351.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.25k | £175.80k | £156.42k | £86.24k | £215.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY AND TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SOME OF THE LEAST DEVELOPED COUNTRIES IN THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: (A) PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH, FOR EXAMPLE BY TRAINING WOMEN FROM THOSE COMMUNITIES AS SOLAR ENGINEERS, DOCTORS, INNOVATORS AND EDUCATORS WHO CAN THEN RETURN TO THEIR VILLAGES TO TEACH THEIR COMMUNITY; (B) PROVIDING EDUCATION TO COMMUNITIES TO MAKE LEARNING ACCESSIBLE AND RELEVANT TO ALL; (C) PROVIDING ACCESS TO ADVOCATES TO HELP COMMUNITIES TAKE CONTROL OF THEIR LIVES AND THEIR WELLBEING; (D) MAKING GRANTS TO COMMUNITIES TO IMPROVE THEIR ACCESS TO ENERGY, CLEAN WATER, HEALTHCARE AND EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES; (E) MAKING GRANTS TO COMMUNITIES TO PROVIDE MEMBERS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY WITH AN OPPORTUNITY TO LEARN A NEW SKILL AND ESTABLISH A VIABLE PROFESSION; AND (F) RAISING AWARENESS OF ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES AND PROVIDING INFORMATION TO DEVELOP SUSTAINABLE COMMUNITIES AND CLEAN JOBS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, "LEAST DEVELOPED COUNTRIES" MEANS THE UNITED NATIONS LIST OF COUNTRIES CATEGORISED AS SUCH AND "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS "DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS".
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cornhill
Hastings Road
Rolvenden
CRANBROOK
Kent
TN17 4PJ
- Phone:
- +447770607429
- Email:
- info-uk@barefootcollege.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window