Financial history DISABILITY SPORTS HUMBER

Charity number: 1169629
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £1.99k £0 £0 £0 £10
Total expenditure £4.52k £805 £1.15k £17.13k £2.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A