Financial history MELVIN HALL COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1170089
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £64.58k £46.81k £55.56k £53.76k £42.56k
Total expenditure £68.45k £50.82k £52.22k £57.88k £41.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £500
Income from government grants N/A £41.29k £26.80k N/A £500