YSGOL Y DDRAIG PTA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ysgol y Ddraig PTA provides funds to Ysgol Y Ddraig, a primary school in Llantwit Major, for the furtherance of the education of the students of the school, providing facilities and equipment to the school, and holding events to foster effective relations between students, parents and carers, staff and the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 31 January 2017: Standard registration
- 14 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.18k | £4.83k | £3.99k | £8.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.14k | £1.69k | £15.70k | £8.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 September 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 September 2020 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 07 October 2019 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND 2.2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window