NORTH DEVON HOUSE OF PRAYER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The North Devon House of Prayer is a prayer room open throughout the week to pray for a variety of topics from justice to missions and for individuals to come worship God and spend time with Him. The North Devon House of Prayer is a relaxed environment focused on worship and intimacy. We are linked relationally to a number of regional houses of prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 November 2016: CIO registration
- NDHOP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Lynch | Chair | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Anne Ware | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Moles | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Ware | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.64k | £20.41k | £53.49k | £25.53k | £22.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.74k | £23.73k | £20.49k | £30.72k | £49.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2016 as amended on 23 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
"TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN NORTH DEVON AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE EVANGELICAL ALLIANCE STATEMENT OF FAITH" (1) DEVELOPING AND MAKING AVAILABLE A CHRISTIAN PRAYER RESOURCE CENTRE IN NORTH DEVON, HELPING PEOPLE TO EXPLORE PRAYER AND THE SPIRITUAL DIMENSION OF LIFE WITH MULTIPLE PRAYER ROOMS AVAILABLE FOR PRAYER AND STAFFED BY A TEAM OF VOLUNTEERS; (2) ORGANISING ACTIVITIES AND SPECIAL WORSHIP SERVICES THAT EXPLORE CHRISTIAN PRAYER IN VARIOUS DIMENSIONS; (3) BEING A RESOURCE HUB OF INFORMATION ABOUT PRAYER AND EDUCATION ABOUT CHRISTIAN SPIRITUALITY FOR LOCAL CONGREGATIONS AND INDIVIDUALS; AND (4) OFFERING CHRISTIAN OUTREACH AND SERVICES FOR COMMUNITY GROUPS BASED AROUND EXPLORING SPIRITUALITY; (5) PROVIDING A DROP-IN SERVICE FOR PEOPLE SEEKING SUPPORT OR A CHAT; (6) RUNNING TRAINING COURSES ABOUT PRAYER AND ASPECTS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; (7) COORDINATING CONFERENCES FOR CHRISTIANS IN THE WIDER AREA; (8) OFFERING HELP IN LOCAL SCHOOLS THROUGH RE CLASSES, ASSEMBLIES AND SCHOOL VISITS TO OUR PREMISES; AND (9) RUNNING A CONFIDENTIAL LISTENING AND HEALING PRAYER SERVICE IN A LOCAL COMMUNITY BUILDING. OUR FACILITIES ARE OPEN ON MOST DAYS AND EVENINGS. (10) UNDERTAKING MISSIONS IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS. (11) TO MAKE GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS IN LINE WITH THE ABOVE OBJECTIVE. (12) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN NORTH DEVON AND TORRIDGE BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS, OR SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NDHOP
CHURCH LANE
BARNSTAPLE
EX31 1BH
- Phone:
- 01271321607
- Email:
- info@ndhop.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window