Financial history FLOURISHING FAMILIES LEEDS

Charity number: 1171626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £211.17k £158.42k £521.18k £977.39k £374.88k
Total expenditure £88.00k £134.10k £164.52k £189.69k £309.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £4.92k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.92k £41.91k £16.56k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £520.70k £968.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £486 £9.39k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £148.50k £168.72k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £10.56k £13.63k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £4.64k £3.64k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £5.47k £7.33k N/A