FENLAND ANIMAL RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fenland Animal Rescue is a registered charity in England and Wales, founded in April 2015. A charity designed to provide an Emergency Service for Cambridgeshire's wildlife, domestic, farm and equine animals in Cambridgeshire. Fenland Animal Rescue operates with a 24hr on-call rescue team, able to respond anywhere within Cambridgeshire to animals in need.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 30 November 2016: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APR 2015 AS AMENDED ON 06 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE A SPECIALIST ANIMAL RESCUE SERVICE TO BOTH WILD AND DOMESTIC ANIMALS THAT HAVE BECOME INJURED, TRAPPED, ORPHANED, ABANDONED OR STRAY IN THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND TO PROVIDE CARE AND TREATMENT FOR SUCH ANIMALS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window