Accounts and annual returns TEESDALE AND WEARDALE SEARCH AND MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity Number: 508877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 26 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 26 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 29 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 29 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 08 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 08 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 24 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 26 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window