TEESDALE AND WEARDALE SEARCH AND MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TWSMRT operates 24 hours per day, 365 days a year. We provide a mountain, search and rescue service for the whole of County Durham, from the high fells in the west to the coastal communities of the North Sea. The Team responds to requests by the Police to a range of incident types, from injured or lost people in the hills to vulnerable missing people in urban settings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 03 July 1979: Standard registration
- TEESDALE AND WEARDALE SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM (Previous name)
- THE UPPER TEESDALE AND WEARDALE FELL RESCUE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR J S OWERS | Chair | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Sauer | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Renwick | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hall | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ascroft | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Wigham | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Roberts | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Warne | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
D W TOWARD | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER BELL | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eric Gilhooley | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
James CHILCOTT | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN LITTLE | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.60k | £102.65k | £51.77k | £68.26k | £46.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.62k | £63.90k | £55.96k | £58.59k | £52.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 08 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 19 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/09/1968 AS AMENDED ON 01/11/1978 AS AMENDED ON 01/06/1979 AS AMENDED ON 17/11/1988 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/1991 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/1999 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2010
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONGST PERSONS ENDANGERED BY ACCIDENTS OR NATURAL HAZARDS, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF TRAINED RESCUE TEAMS TO OPERATE THROUGHOUT COUNTY DURHAM OR AND ANY OTHER PLACE IF REQUESTED. 2) TO SEEK TO EDUCATE ALL POTENTIAL USERS OF THE HILLS AND COUNTRYSIDE, ADVISING OF POSSIBLE DANGERS IN THE AREA AND AIMING TO PREVENT TRAGEDIES OR MISHAPS BY GIVING TALKS AND DEMONSTRATIONS TO INTERESTED ORGANISATIONS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY DURHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Teesdale and Weardale Search and Mo
The Chris Scott Mountain Search and
Lanchester Road
Durham
County Durham
DH1 5RA
- Phone:
- 01833630999
- Email:
- mail@twsmrt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window