Financial history SIDCUP DEBT ADVICE

Charity number: 1169856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £5.80k £16.45k £4.73k £7.35k £14.63k
Total expenditure £6.27k £5.50k £7.67k £11.93k £13.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A