Royal Air Force Aircraft Engineering Apprentices’Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of young people for the public benefit in particular but not exclusively by making grants and awards to students in full-time education and provide advice and information. To promote the history of the Royal Air Force Apprentices ( 1920 - 1993).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 March 2017: Standard registration
- RAFAircraft Engineering Apprentice Trust (Working name)
- RAF HALTON APPRENTICE TRUST (Previous name)
- RAF HALTON APPRENTICES' TRUST (Previous name)
- RAF HALTON APPRENTICES' TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Tott | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Benson | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wilkinson | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY KEELING | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
BARRIE DAVID MORRIS | Trustee | 22 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.19k | £39.00k | £5.00k | £7.50k | £7.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.58k | £43.33k | £5.08k | £8.37k | £7.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 2017 as amended on 11 Nov 2023as amended on 11 Nov 2023as amended on 12 Sep 2023 as amended on 25 Aug 2023 as amended on 11 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
To advance the education of the public in the history of the Royal Air Force Apprentices (1920-onwards) for the public benefit in particularly but not exclusively by providing grants and information and by raising awareness.
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAFAEAT c/o No.1 SofTT HQ AO
RAF Cosford
Albrighton
WOLVERHAMPTON
Shropshire
WV7 3EX
- Phone:
- +44 30 016 31048
- Email:
- Baz.Morris509@mod.gov.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window