LANHYDROCK WAR MEMORIAL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The hall is used for a variety of activities including, Yoga, Youth and adult dance groups, craft, photography, floral art, health support, carers, pre-school and religious groups. Wedding receptions, funeral teas, children's parties and fundraising events. Community social events - harvest supper, bingo Children's Christmas Party , Whist Drives and Carol singing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 06 January 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Pearce | Chair | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nhlanhla Anne Mutlokwa Young | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jason David Coad | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Mary Seton Coad | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trudy Lisa May | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffrey Roffey | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Harriet Coad | Trustee | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Anne Shenton | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Birch | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY COAD | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Damon Bayley | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev ROGER AUSTIN MAY | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER FREDERICK MILLER | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW NICHOLAS VICTOR WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER JUNE MARY HOSKIN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS GEORGE HOSKIN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GILBERT KEITH MAY | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.18k | £14.55k | £18.51k | £7.71k | £14.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.07k | £7.04k | £6.61k | £15.12k | £20.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF LANHYDROCK ("AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Boxwell Park
BODMIN
PL31 2BD
- Phone:
- 01208 75989
- Email:
- d.brown636@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window