Accounts and annual returns PRIORS GREEN COMMUNITY HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1169650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 July 2024 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 November 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 April 2021 162 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 April 2021 162 days late Download Open in new window