Financial history PRIORS GREEN COMMUNITY HALL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1169650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £31.05k £20.48k £19.69k £19.72k £21.97k
Total expenditure £24.63k £13.36k £8.15k £16.51k £14.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A