PRIDE IN ELY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community based charity for LGBTQ-plus individuals in Ely. We have created a safe place for people to meet in Ely. Our first Ely Pride event was held in August 2018 and this has been well supported within the City. Our ultimate aim is to be able to offer more support by working with other organisations and in particular to educate around diversity and inclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 February 2024
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 19 December 2016: CIO registration
- ELY PRIDE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Timothy Pittock | Chair | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Marsh | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Virginie Ganivet | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David White | Trustee | 16 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/02/2020 | 03/02/2021 | 03/02/2022 | 03/02/2023 | 03/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.03k | £679 | £1.46k | £11.21k | £14.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.61k | £566 | £431 | £12.99k | £14.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £750 | N/A | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 February 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 February 2023 | 27 July 2024 | 237 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2023 | 27 July 2024 | 237 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 February 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 February 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 03 February 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 February 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY BY: (A) PROVIDING SUPPORT SERVICES FOR LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANSGENDERED AND OTHER SEXUALITIES AND IDENTITIES (LGBT+); (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION TO IMPROVE THE UNDERSTANDING OF LGBT+ PEOPLE; (C) ORGANISING SUPPORT MEETINGS AND EVENTS EXCLUSIVELY FOR LGBT+ PEOPLE; (D) ORGANISING INCLUSIVE EVENTS TO ENCOURAGE THE ACCEPTANCE OF ALL PEOPLE REGARDLESS OF SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER IDENTITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 10
Centre E
24 Barton Road
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB7 4DE
- Phone:
- 07965206225
- Email:
- hello@prideinely.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window