LON Y BUGAIL TRUST

Charity Number: 1172894
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Lon y Bugail Trust manages community facility - Chirk Bunkhouse/Lon y Bugail Hall - is located in Chirk, Wrexham. The Trust hires out the facility to local, national, international groups, organisations, individuals for meetings, parties, sleepovers and longer stays; manages every aspect of the building and is responsible for all bookings. Facility is advertized through social media and press.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £19,682
Total expenditure: £11,318

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 May 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rebecca Diane Jones Trustee 18 October 2018
None on record
GLYNN POTTS Trustee 09 February 2016
None on record
LYNNE MAREE PAINTER Trustee 09 January 2015
SHROPSHIRE CHILD CONTACT CENTRE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.46k £14.60k £9.93k £17.34k £19.68k
Total expenditure £11.84k £34.62k £8.00k £24.99k £11.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £14.00k £2.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 20 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
93 CROGEN
CHIRK
WREXHAM
LL14 5BJ
Phone:
01691772512