THE UNION OF MUSLIM ORGANISATIONS OF UK AND EIRE TRUST (ABBREVIATED THE U M O TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
**IN LIQUIDATION**THE TRUSTEES INTEND TO CONTINUE THE LEGACY OF THE FOUNDER, DR SYED AZIZ PASHA, MAY HE REST IN PEACE, WHO WORKED TIRELESSLY TO HELP AND UNITE ALL MUSLIMS IN THE BRITISH ISLES AND TO SHARE A BALANCED UNDERSTANDING OF ISLAM WITH ALL PEOPLE. OUR INITIAL PROJECT WILL BE TO ESTABLISH AN EDUCATIONAL, CULTURAL AND RELIGIOUS CENTRE IN LONDON, TO BE CALLED THE UMO TRUST CENTRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 19 January 2017: CIO registration
- THE UMO TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Syed Arshad Nadeem | Chair | 14 December 2014 |
|
|||||
SAIMOON AKTER | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|||||
QUASMA SAEED | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SYED GHULAM ULLAH HUSSAIN | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £496 | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE UMO TRUST (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND MORE PARTICULARLY IN LONDON AND IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN EIRE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH AND RELIGIOUS PRACTICES OF ISLAM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QUR’AN AND THE SUNNAH AMONGST MUSLIMS IN PARTICULAR AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF GENERAL AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT CONCERNING THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF ISLAM; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES; (E) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND COUNTRIES AFFECTED; (F) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THESE ARE IN HARMONY WITH THE QUR’AN AND THE SUNNAH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wilkin Chapman Business Solutions
Cartergate House
26 Chantry Lane
GRIMSBY
DN31 2LJ
- Phone:
- 01472 806699
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window