ANIMAL ANTIKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal Antiks operates on a working farm based in the village of North Marston, Buckinghamshire located in between the towns of Aylesbury and Buckingham. On a daily basis the farm supports children and adults with all disabilities, bringing them together in a safe and unique non-segregated environment, promoting and enhancing key life, social and functional skills through bespoke therapeutic
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 16 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH LOUISE KETTLETY | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Sear | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Donna Ray Daniels- Moss | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £191.45k | £387.31k | £579.61k | £411.81k | £160.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.62k | £307.02k | £579.89k | £405.22k | £161.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £73.10k | N/A | £206.83k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.94k | £86.13k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £13.55k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £566.06k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £560.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £19.56k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED (IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THOSE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SOCIAL OR EMOTIONAL DISABILITIES OR DISADVANTAGES) BY PROVIDING EQUINE-ASSISTED THERAPEUTIC AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES THAT MAY ALSO INVOLVE OTHER ANIMALS IN ORDER TO ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY (2) TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL-USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS IN SUB-CLAUSE (1), "EMOTIONAL DISABILITIES" WILL ENCOMPASS THOSE BENEFICIARIES WHO STRUGGLE WITH LOW SELF-ESTEEM OR SELF-CONFIDENCE, OR HAVE DIFFICULTY WITH COMMUNICATION AND RELATIONSHIPS OR IN REGULATING EMOTIONS (SUCH AS ANGER, ANXIETY AND SADNESS), OR WHO LACK EMOTIONAL STABILITY AND RESILIENCE. "DISADVANTAGES" WILL ENCOMPASS THOSE BENEFICIARIES WHO EXPERIENCE SOCIAL OR EDUCATIONAL EXCLUSION OR LACK OF OPPORTUNITY, TAKING INTO ACCOUNT FACTORS SUCH AS SOCIO-ECONOMIC OR EDUCATIONAL BACKGROUND OR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, COMMUNICATIONAL, BEHAVIOURAL OR EMOTIONAL DIFFICULTIES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS); CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Farm
St. Johns Lane
North Marston
BUCKINGHAM
MK18 3PU
- Phone:
- 01296 670996
- Email:
- office@animalantiks.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window