Financial history EQUALITY AND INCLUSION PARTNERSHIP (EQUIP)

Charity number: 1169436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £194.97k £279.26k £237.80k £168.64k £256.61k
Total expenditure £204.70k £190.60k £163.68k £249.88k £215.24k
Income from government contracts £157.06k £135.88k £135.38k £155.38k £137.54k
Income from government grants £29.58k £73.12k £48.63k N/A £47.23k