Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD EMMANUEL'S CHAPEL

Charity Number: 1169428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £30.53k £49.19k £52.96k £105.62k £134.00k
Total expenditure £14.14k £19.36k £29.14k £46.62k £61.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A