Financial history PHOENIX AUTISM TRUST

Charity Number: 1172227
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £653.17k £998.32k £1.16m £1.79m £1.86m
Total expenditure £434.53k £755.16k £888.64k £1.55m £1.82m
Income from government contracts N/A £996.39k £1.13m £1.72m £1.82m
Income from government grants N/A £1.92k £31.73k £60.58k £16.74k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £1.16m £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £653.17k £998.32k £0 £1.78m £1.84m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £9.32k £20.15k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £434.53k £755.16k £829.24k £1.52m £1.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £59.40k £25.71k £25.20k
Expenditure - Governance £2.20k £2.88k £7.69k £10.63k £16.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0