Trustees LEICESTER CHINESE CHRISTIAN CHURCH
Charity number: 1170046

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILLIP CHAN | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wing Kwong Tang | Trustee | 20 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kwok Kiu Tsang | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Feng Chen | Trustee | 14 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lai Yee Hung | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ada Ho Yan Chan-Chim | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kin Fung Martin Hui | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ka Wai Chau | Trustee | 15 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sai Wai Ip | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIM MAN TANG | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr GHULAM ANDRE NG | Trustee | 23 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.