146TH SHEFFIELD (OLD NORTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As Scouts, we believe in preparing young people with skills for life. We encourage our young people to do more, learn more and be more. Each week, the 146th Sheffield (Old Norton) Scout Group give young people the opportunity to enjoy fun and adventure while developing the skill they need to succeed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 07 July 1979: Standard registration
- 09 October 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 March 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Thomas Hoar | Chair | 07 March 2017 |
|
|||||||
Craig Andrew Bee | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Stephanie Anne Akitt | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robin Wood | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julia Dominique Jacobs-Johnson | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.72k | £12.43k | £21.24k | £5.68k | £7.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.42k | £787 | £4.37k | £5.35k | £26.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.03k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2023 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 December 2023 | 680 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 February 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
GRAVES PARK/NORTON AREA OF SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Behind 339 Warminster Road
SHEFFIELD
S8 8PS
- Phone:
- 01142362100
- Email:
- scouts@digi.ninja
- Website:
-
opencharities.org/charities/508896
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window