THE GOOD GRIEF PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TGGP provides comfort and support to families grieving after the sudden or untimely death of a loved one - in particular the death of a son or daughter. We encourage an active and creative response to grief, we raise awareness about the needs of the bereaved and promote an understanding of what it means to grieve in a culture that has difficulty talking openly about death, dying or bereavement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 November 2016: CIO registration
- BEYOND GOODBYE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW MICHAEL FREEDMAN | Chair | 16 February 2017 |
|
|||||
Caroline Whaley | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Redwood | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kieron James Milsom | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Byng | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JAMES EDMONDS | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANE CAROLYN HARRIS | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
TOM KIHL | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.47k | £34.33k | £45.32k | £157.88k | £91.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.96k | £40.81k | £54.79k | £76.09k | £93.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL WELFARE OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED THE UNTIMELY DEATH OF A CLOSE RELATIVE BY: 4.1. THE PROVISION OF SERVICES INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, COUNSELLING AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT; AND 4.2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO THE EFFECT THAT A BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS CAN HAVE ON THOSE INVOLVED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Rowes Farm Barns
Aish Road
Stoke Gabriel
TOTNES
Devon
TQ9 6RT
- Phone:
- 07815195049
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window