THE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity Number: 1171623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

WE MAKE GRANTS FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF CHURCHES IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE AND CHURCHES IN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWELL AND NOTTINGHAM WHICH ARE NOT IN NOTTINGHAMSHIRE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £76,446
Total expenditure: £51,255

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 February 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAEME RENTON Chair 06 March 2017
None on record
Rev Alison Grant Milbank Trustee 18 March 2024
THE ARCHBISHOP'S EXAMINATION IN THEOLOGY TRUST
Received: On time
Margaret Ann Bennett-Samuels Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
PROFESSOR MICHAEL JONES FSA Trustee 06 March 2017
None on record
RICHARD ASSHETON CRAVEN-SMITH-MILNES Trustee 06 March 2017
None on record
ANDREW PARIS Trustee 06 March 2017
CHARITY OF EDWARD DICKINSON
Received: On time
POOR'S LAND
Received: On time
PROFESSOR JOHN VINCENT BECKETT Trustee 06 March 2017
THE LAXTON VISITOR CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
ANTHONY GEORGE EYRE MARRIOTT Trustee 06 March 2017
BELL ROPE LAND
Received: On time
Dr CHRISTOPHER JOHN BROOKE Trustee 06 March 2017
SOUTHWELL COMMUNITY ARCHAEOLOGY GROUP
Received: On time
DAVID DIGBY ATKINS Trustee 15 February 2017
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LTD
Received: On time
GRANTHAM & VALE OF BELVOIR METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JONATHAN NEIL DAWSON Trustee 15 February 2017
CHURCH MONUMENTS SOCIETY
Received: On time
RICHARD BRACKENBURY Trustee 15 February 2017
None on record
Dr Jennifer Alexander FSA Trustee 17 September 2002
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £47.16k £44.90k £45.89k £29.81k £76.45k
Total expenditure £51.00k £53.27k £60.81k £65.71k £51.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
JND Accounting
Unit C 17 Kestrel Business Centre
Private Road 2
Colwick Industrial Estate
NOTTINGHAM
NG4 2JR
Phone:
01159877291
Website:

No information available