Financial history FRIENDS OF CAPE CHILD

Charity number: 1173004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £274 £956 £4.94k £13.13k £11.01k
Total expenditure £988 £905 £4.25k £7.36k £11.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A