Financial history SHIA JAFARI MASHAYAKHI MOMIN JAMAT

Charity number: 1170540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.61k £35.86k £55.70k £49.51k £38.75k
Total expenditure £17.85k £38.69k £38.36k £24.97k £25.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A