WEEECHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY RECYCLES AND REFURBISHES DONATED USED IT GOODS FOR SALE AS SCRAP AND TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, INCLUDING SOME ITEMS RESERVED FOR THOSE ON LOWER INCOMES WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO PURCHASE COMPUTER EQUIPMENT. THE CHARITY HAS STAFF EMPLOYED TO TEACH VOLUNTEERS SKILLS INCLUDING EMPLOYMENT SKILLS. SURPLUS CASH IS DONATED TO OTHER CHARITABLE CAUSES IN THE LOCAL AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 October 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Hilton | Chair | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Brock | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bennet | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Preston Mr | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £203.93k | £212.30k | £258.86k | £194.89k | £202.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.26k | £188.80k | £218.26k | £242.59k | £225.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £63.74k | £118.46k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 06 December 2024 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2023
(These accounts |
06 December 2024 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 05 April 2022 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 12 October 2020 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE, RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS; THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE RECYCLING AND PROVISION OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONIC ITEMS. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN WARRINGTON AND OTHER PARTS OF THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE, BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
WeeeCharity
11 Tanning Court
WARRINGTON
WA1 2HF
- Phone:
- 01925474849
- Email:
- admin@weeecharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window