K-9 RESCUE REMEDY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
K-9RR's main objective is to stop as many dogs as possible from going into rescue. We do this by running training on Sundays to help rescue dog owners to understand their dogs behaviour, the law with regard to owning a dog and their responsibility as owners. They train to pass the Kennel Club's Good Citizens Scheme. In addition K-9RR is also a small foster-based rescue for all breeds of dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 17 May 2017: CIO registration
- K9RR (Working name)
- K-9RR (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsten Elisabeth Fribbens | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jacqueline Forder-Goodall | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Carey Amanda Prichard | Trustee | 20 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Daniel Limpkin | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kim Marriott | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Duckett | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE WALLING | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANN LIMPKIN BEd | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.73k | £11.89k | £21.13k | £24.39k | £21.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.81k | £13.39k | £19.98k | £4.50k | £22.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 February 2023 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 May 2017 as amended on 30 Jun 2018 as amended on 30 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Bank
Sandrock Hill
Sedlescombe
Battle
TN33 0QR
- Phone:
- 07483 225071
- Email:
- k9rescueremedy@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window