LOVE ME, LOVE MY FACE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offer relief of people with TCS by the provision of information, advice and financial support for essential medical supplies/procedures through a grant process. Advance education and promote wider knowledge and understanding of the problems of TCS and other craniofacial conditions amongst the public through workshops and social media.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Brazil
- Canada
- Chile
- Ireland
- Mexico
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 11 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JOHN WHITING | Chair | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Lancaster | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PENNY SUZANNE WOOD | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.73k | £12.72k | £2.39k | £3.73k | £3.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.90k | £9.26k | £6.99k | £10.40k | £4.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH TREACHER COLLINS SYNDROME (TCS) AND OTHER CRANIOFACIAL CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR ESSENTIAL MEDICAL SUPPLIES/PROCEDURES. 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE A WIDER KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PROBLEMS OF TREACHER COLLINS SYNDROME (TCS) AND OTHER CRANIOFACIAL CONDITIONS AMONGST THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 OAK RISE
PONTEFRACT
WF8 2WD
- Phone:
- 07957356917
- Email:
- love.myface@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window